IL HB3203 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Overdose Prevention and Harm Reduction Act. Provides that a pharmacist may sell fentanyl test strips over-the-counter to the public to test for the presence of fentanyl, a fentanyl analogue, or a drug adulterant within a controlled substance. Provides that a county health department may distribute fentanyl test strips at the county health department facility for no fee. Amends the Drug Paraphernalia Control Act. Provides that "drug paraphernalia" does not include equipment, products, or materials to analyze or test for the presence of fentanyl, a fentanyl analogue, or a drug adulterant within a controlled substance.
Title
PREVENT FENTANYL EXPOSURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0336 |
2023-07-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Health Committee; by Voice Vote |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 710 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 600 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |