IL HB3207 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Legislative Information System Act. Provides that, as soon as practicable after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Legislative Information System shall make available to the public through the website maintained by the System the audio and video recordings of all committee hearings of the General Assembly occurring on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act. Provides that the committee hearing audio and video recordings made available by the System shall be posted on the website maintained by the System for at least 30 days after the committee hearing at which the recording was made.
Title
GA CMTE HEARING-TRANSPARENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 145 | 5.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3207&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3207.htm |