IL HB3233 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-12 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-12 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
VEH CD-SHARE ROAD-LARGE TRUCKS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Transportation |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Transportation |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Transportation |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 2-112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |