IL HB3234 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires that each election authority (i) conduct an election day audit of a random sample of 10% of votes cast and (ii) provide by contract or employment for the performance by one or more independent auditors of post-election parallel tabulations and audits. Provides for the scope of the audits and the resulting reports. Requires that optical scan technology and direct recording electronic voting systems meet certain federal and independent testing standards. With respect to early voting, requires that an election authority using only direct recording electronic voting systems have paper ballots available for voters wishing to use them.
Title
ELEC CD-EQUIPMENT/AUDITS
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 19A-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 21B-95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 24B-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24B-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24C-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24C-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24C-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 21B heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3234&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3234.htm |