IL HB3257 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 and the Unified Code of Corrections. Permits currently employed State correctional officers to carry their own firearms off duty without being in violation of the unlawful use of weapons and aggravated unlawful use of a weapon statutes if they meet certain training requirements. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall supply its retired correctional officers and retired personnel of the Parole Division with an identification card that acknowledges years of service and title of employee at his or her time of retirement from the Department of Corrections. Deletes provision that parole agents and supervisors who are discharged from employment of the Illinois Department of Corrections shall no longer be considered law enforcement officials and all their rights as law enforcement officials shall be revoked permanently.
Title
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER-FIREARMS
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] | Rep. John Anthony [R] | Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Reginald Phillips [R] |
Rep. Andrew Skoog [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3257&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3257.htm |