IL HB3276 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Certified Community Behavioral Health Clinics Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services and the Department of Human Services (Departments) to develop a pilot program based upon the certified community behavioral health clinic criteria and the prospective payment system methodology issued by the federal Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration and the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services as created under the federal Protecting Access to Medicare Act of 2014. Provides that implementation of the pilot program is subject to federal approval. Requires the Departments to seek federal financial assistance for the pilot program and certified community behavioral health clinic technical assistance and support through all potential federal sources, including, but not limited to, the federal Delivery System Reform Incentive Payment program. Contains provisions concerning the timeline for implementing the pilot program; applications for a federal Section 1115 waiver to implement the pilot program; the adoption of rules to implement the pilot program; implementation of the pilot program for certified community behavioral health clinic services under the medical assistance fee-for-service and managed care programs; payments to community behavioral health clinics under the certified community behavioral health clinic prospective payment system methodology for each qualifying visit; staffing requirements for certified community behavioral health clinics; reporting requirements; and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
COMM BEHAVIORAL HEALTH CLINICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3276&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3276.htm |