IL HB3296 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective Date June 27, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective Date June 27, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Provides that an annual regulatory fee paid by a credit union to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall not be more than $210,000 (rather than $141,875). Effective immediately.
Title
CREDIT UNION REGULATORY FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | House | Effective Date June 27, 2023 |
2023-06-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0107 |
2023-06-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-017-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2023 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 005-000-000 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 21, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-05-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-040-000 |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2023-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 008-004-000 |
2023-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-20 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-04-20 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 008-003-000 |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 008-004-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 305 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |