IL HB3303 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Business Improvement District Law. Provides for the establishment of business improvement districts by a county or municipality by ordinance after petition of a percentage of property owners or business owners, creation of a district plan, notice, and hearings. Provides that a business improvement district may impose district charges on property owners whose real properties are located within the business improvement district or on businesses within a business improvement district. Provides that the county or municipality shall contract with a district management association to administer or implement activities and improvements specified in the district plan. Contains provisions relating to district plans, formation of a district, district boundaries, issuance of bonds, terms and renewal of districts, amendment to district plans, governance of the district, reports of a district management association, dissolution, and legislative purpose. Limits the concurrent exercise of home rule powers. Defines terms. Effective 120 days after becoming law.
Title
BUSINESS IMPROVEMENT DISTRICTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee; 006-004-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |