IL HB3324 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $45,000,000 to the Department of Human Services from the General Revenue Fund for a 3% cost-of-living adjustment for providers serving individuals with developmental disabilities and mental illness. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
$DHS-COLA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3324&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/PDF/09700HB3324.pdf |