IL HB3327 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Requires the Illinois Commerce Commission to conduct at least one workshop and issue a report concerning how the development and construction of microgrids could strengthen and enhance the electric grid through reliance on the diverse supply options being connected to the grid by traditional suppliers and new market participants, such as the electric utilities' customers. Specifies objectives for the workshop and report. Defines "microgrid". Provides for repeal of the provisions on January 1, 2017. Effective immediately.
Title
ICC-REPORT-MICROGRIDS
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3327&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3327.htm |