IL HB3431 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Film Production Services Tax Credit Act of 2008. Provides that the term "accredited production" does not include a talk show produced for a local or regional market and does not include a reality competition production. Provides that the credit applies on a permanent basis. Provides that the credit includes 5% of the Illinois labor expenditures generated by the employment of residents of the State who reside outside of the metropolitan area. Provides that the credit amount shall be increased by 5% if 50% or more of the total hours of principal filming or taping of the production are completed in the State but outside of the metropolitan area. Provides that the term "metropolitan area" means the City of Chicago and any part of the State located within 30 miles of the City of Chicago. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-FILM PRODUCTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 16 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 16 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3431&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3431.htm |