IL HB3511 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if property qualifies for the senior citizens homestead exemption, but the property owner fails to apply for the exemption during the application period, then the property owner may apply to any or all of the taxing districts in which the property is located to receive a refund of that taxing district's share of the excess property taxes extended against the property as a result of the failure to apply the exemption. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR REFUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3511&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3511.htm |