IL HB3514 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983, General Not For Profit Corporation Act of 1986, Limited Liability Company Act, Uniform Partnership Act (1997), and Uniform Limited Partnership Act (2001). Provides that filings with the Secretary of State by entities organized under those Acts may not be deemed expedited services subject to certain fees solely because the filings are made electronically.
Title
BUSINESS ELECTRONIC FILINGS
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0186 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-03-15 | House | Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Al Riley |
2017-03-14 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Al Riley |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-001-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 105 | 115.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 50-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 206 | 108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 215 | 1308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 5 | 15.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |