IL HB3566 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Extends the carryback and carryover periods for net losses by an additional 5 years.
Title
INC TAX-NET LOSSES
Sponsors
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Darlene Senger [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] |
Rep. Richard Morthland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-02-24 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-02-24 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-02-24 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3566&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3566.htm |