IL HB3568 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Reinstates the training expense credit for tax years ending on or after December 31, 2011 and on or before December 30, 2021. Increases the amount of the credit from 1.6% of training expenses to 2% of training expenses. Provides that the training expense credit earned on or after December 31, 2011 may be carried forward. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-TRAINING EXPENSE CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] |
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Nybo |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3568&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3568.htm |