IL HB3568 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax checkoff for the Alzheimer's Research Tax Checkoff Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Department on Aging for the purpose of making grants to associations and entities that conduct research concerning Alzheimer's disease, provide services to individuals and families impacted by Alzheimer's disease, or both. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CHECKOFF-ALZHEIMER'S
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.878 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 507GGG | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3568&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3568.htm |