IL HB3613 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the School Code. In provisions concerning medical prescriptions for schools, Provides that the school district, public school, charter school, or nonpublic school may maintain a supply of undesignated oxygen tanks in any secure location that is accessible before, during, and after school where a person with developmental disabilities person is most at risk, including, but not limited to, classrooms and lunchrooms. Provides that a physician, a physician assistant who has prescriptive authority in accordance with the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987, or an advanced practice registered nurse who has prescriptive authority in accordance with the Nurse Practice Act may prescribe undesignated oxygen tanks in the name of the school district, public school, charter school, or nonpublic school to be maintained for use when necessary. Provides that any supply of oxygen tanks shall be maintained in accordance with the manufacturer's instructions and with the local fire department's rules.
Title
SCH CD-OXYGEN TANK
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Lilian Jimenez [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro [R] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0196 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 22-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |