IL HB3619 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Public Corruption Profit Forfeiture Act and amends the Election Code. Provides for the forfeiture to the State of Illinois of proceeds and profits derived through violations of the statutes concerning intimidation by public officials, bribery, or providing, attempting, offering to provide or soliciting, accepting, or attempting to accept a kickback, or including, directly or indirectly, the amount of any kickback prohibited in the contract price charged by a subcontractor to a prime contractor or a higher tier subcontractor or in the contract price charged by a prime contractor to any unit of State or local government for a public contract a kickback. Provides for distribution of the proceeds from forfeited property. Includes a continuing appropriation to the Department of State Police.
Title
PUBLIC CORRUPTION FORFEITURE
Sponsors
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Renee Kosel [R] | Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Richard Morthland [R] | Rep. Pam Roth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-8.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3619&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3619.htm |