IL HB3654 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Underground Utility Facilities Damage Prevention Act. Provides that after the effective date all new or replaced underground utility lines must be marked with detectable underground warning tape, which is able to be traced by inductive locating. Requires that the marking shall be a minimum of 6 inches and be buried as close to the ground surface as possible, or between 4 and 6 inches deep. Provides that the warning tape shall be American Public Works Association color-coded to match the type of utility line it is protecting.
Title
UTILITIES-UNDERGROUND MARKINGS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-24 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3654&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB3654.htm |