IL HB3654 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, a health care practitioner shall provide without charge one complete copy of the a patient's records if the records are being requested by the patient, or a person, entity, or organization presenting a valid authorization for the release of records signed by the patient or the patient's legally authorized representative, for the purpose of use in supporting a claim for federal veterans' disability benefits.
Title
VETERANS-MEDICAL RECORD COPIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-08 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 8-2001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |