IL HB3686 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes it an unlawful business practice for operators of Internet websites, webpages, online services, online applications, social networking websites, or mobile applications directed at minors to not allow a minor to request and obtain removal of content or information posted by the minor or not allow the minor to remove the content or information themselves. Makes it an unlawful business practice for operators of Internet websites, webpages, online services, online applications, social networking websites, or mobile applications who have actual knowledge that a minor is using its Internet website, webpage, online service, online application, social networking website, or mobile application to not allow the minor to request and obtain removal of content or information posted by the minor or not allow the minor to remove the content or information themselves. Makes it an unlawful business practice to not inform minors that are registered users of the service that they may have content or information posted by them removed and provide instructions on how to remove or obtain removal of the content or information. Provides exceptions. Provides that the amendatory Act does not limit the authority of a law enforcement agency to obtain any content or information as required by law or court order. Provides that third parties may not be found in violation of the new provisions. Provides that operators of Internet websites, webpages, online services, online applications, social networking websites, or mobile applications are not required to seek age information about users.
Title
INTERNET PROTECTION FOR MINORS
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-11-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-11-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2013-11-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | First Reading |
2013-09-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |