IL HB3705 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-21 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-21 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person may not operate a neighborhood vehicle on a street, road, or highway without obtaining a certificate of title, registering the vehicle with the Secretary of State, and obtaining a liability insurance policy covering the vehicle in accordance with the mandatory insurance provisions of the Illinois Vehicle Code.
Title
VEH CD-NEIGHBORHOOD VEHICLES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-21 | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken | |
2009-10-05 | Placed on Calendar Total Veto October 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Vetoed | |
2009-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-18 | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Transportation; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-04-14 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-010-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | First Reading | |
2009-02-24 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |