IL HB3725 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits misrepresentation of a service animal when he or she knowingly represents, expressly or impliedly, that the animal is a service animal for the purpose of securing the rights and privileges afforded to a person with a disability accompanied by a service animal and the person knew or should have known that the animal is not a service animal. Provides that the refusal to answer questions from a law enforcement officer permitted under federal regulation creates a permissive inference that the animal is not a service animal and the law enforcement officer may require the person to remove the animal from the place of public accommodation. Provides that misrepresentation of a service animal is a petty offense. Defines "service animal".
Title
MISREPRESENT-SERVICE ANIMAL
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3725&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3725.htm |