IL HB3731 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0088
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0088
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Allows school boards to award high school diplomas to honorably discharged veterans who served in the armed forces of the United States during the Vietnam Conflict. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH-CD-DIPLOMA-VIETNAM VETERAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-27 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0088 | |
2009-07-27 | Effective Date July 27, 2009 | |
2009-07-27 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass Education; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | First Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |