IL HB3748 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Commission to End the Disparities Facing the African-American Community Act. Provides that the Commission shall submit its findings and specific recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015 (now December 31, 2013). Extends the date of repeal to July 1, 2016 (now July 1, 2014). Effective immediately.
Title
DISPARITIES COMM-REPEAL EXT
Sponsors
Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Charles Jefferson [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] |
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0684 |
2014-06-30 | House | Effective Date June 30, 2014 |
2014-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-11-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-11-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5020 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5020 | 95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |