IL HB3756 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Provides that it is unlawful for any person to take or attempt to take aquatic life by means of a pitchfork, underwater spear gun, bow and arrow or bow and arrow device, including a sling shot bow, spear, or gig along, upon, across, or from any public right-of-way or highway in the State.
Title
FISH & AQUATIC LIFE CODE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
515 | 5 | 10-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |