IL HB3773 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Requires the court to release a defendant charged with possession of less than 1 gram of heroin, possession of less than 1 gram of cocaine, or possession of less than 10 grams of cannabis on his or own recognizance if certain criteria are met. If the release on own recognizance criteria are not met and the court finds that monetary bail is not necessary to secure the appearance of the defendant, the court may require the defendant's monitoring under electronic surveillance as a condition of his or her release.
Title
CD CRIM PRO BAIL DRUGS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-01-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2014-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-12-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 110-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3773&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3773.htm |