IL HB3815 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Code. Provides for exemption from the Code of employees having demonstrable, defined advanced skills in statistical research and data analytics who are employed in research and analysis units of executive branch agencies or whose duties are primarily focused on developing information sharing capabilities across executive branch agencies and between State agencies and units of local government. Amends the Criminal Justice Information Act. Abolishes the Illinois Integrated Justice System Implementation Board. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Creates the Illinois State Criminal Justice Data, Research, and Implementation Advisory Committee to (1) examine existing State and local criminal justice data collection systems and assess agencies' capacities to effectively analyze data and evaluate criminal justice trends and programming based on national best practices; and (2) publish an annual report, detailing its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Governor. Provides that the administrative support for the Committee shall be provided by the Illinois Sentencing Policy Advisory Council. Provides that each department, agency, board, or authority of the State or any unit of local government shall provide records or other information to the Committee as requested by the Committee to carry out its duties, provided that the Committee and provider of the information shall make appropriate arrangements to ensure that the Committee and provider of the information to the Committee does not violate any applicable laws.
Title
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DATA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3930 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 415 | 4c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3815&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3815.htm |