IL HB3827 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the maximum amount of the education expense credit to $1,500 (currently, $500). Adds athletic fees, driver's education fees, and fees and costs associated with certain out-of-school activities to the list of qualified education expenses.
Title
INC TX-EDUCATION CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-03-13 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3827&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3827.htm |