IL HB3850 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Knight-Silas Legacy Act. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits a Class 1 felony offense of aggravated battery when the person is over the age of 21 and, in committing a battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, he or she knowingly causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee. Provides that a person commits a Class 2 felony offense of aggravated battery when the person is over the age of 21 and, in committing a battery, other than by discharge of a firearm, he or she knows the individual battered to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee. Provides that "Department of Children and Family Services employee" includes any Department case worker or investigator employed by an agency or organization providing social work, case work, or investigative services under a contract with or a grant from the Department of Children and Family Services.
Title
TREATMENT COURT STATUTES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-05-09 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-04-01 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-04-01 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2022-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-002 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; D. Turner |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-05-12 | Senate | To Problem- Solving Courts |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-04-23 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-18 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-18 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 166 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 166 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 166 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 166 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 166 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 167 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 167 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 167 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 167 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 167 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 167 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 167 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 168 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 168 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 168 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 168 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 168 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 168 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |