IL HB3947 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that each property tax bill shall contain a separate statement for each taxing district setting forth the dollar amount of tax due that will be used by the taxing district for law enforcement purposes. Requires taxing districts to certify this information to the county clerk on or before the last Tuesday in December.
Title
PROP TX-BILL INCLUDE POLICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 20-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3947&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3947.htm |