IL HB3949 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Requires the county board of Cook County to appoint an independent county personnel director. Provides that, through December 31, 2011, the independent personnel director shall appoint all officers and employees of Cook County and shall assume the duties of the county civil service commission. Requires the civil service commission to perform duties and functions as directed by the independent personnel director and to otherwise operate in an advisory capacity to the director. Effective immediately.
Title
COOK CNTY-PERSONNEL DIRECTOR
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Bassi [R] | Rep. Robert Biggins [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Coulson [R] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] |
Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Rosemary Mulligan [R] | Rep. Angelo Saviano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-02-26 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano | |
2009-02-26 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-02-26 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-02-26 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3949&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB3949.htm |