IL HB3955 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that any communication regarding a State agency contract received by an agency, agency head, or other agency employee from a member of the General Assembly shall promptly be reported to that agency's ethics officer by the recipient of the communication and by any other employee of that agency who responds to the communication. Provides that the ethics officer shall require that the communication be promptly made a part of the record of the General Assembly, and the communication shall be made publicly available on the Illinois General Assembly website. Specifies further information to be provided by the ethics officer. Amends the Legislative Information System Act. Requires the Legislative Information System to establish a page for electronic public access on the General Assembly's website that provides information on any communication regarding a State agency contract received by an agency, agency head, or other agency employee from a member of the General Assembly. Effective immediately.
Title
GA MEMBER-AGENCY COMMUNICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-11-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 145 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 5-53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3955&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3955.htm |