IL HB4021 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to evaluate the release of contaminants if it determines that the extent of soil, soil gas, or groundwater contamination may extend beyond the boundary of the site where the release occurred (now, only if "soil or groundwater contamination may extend beyond the boundary of the site where the release occurred"). Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to notify the owner of the contaminated property if soil contamination beyond the boundary of the site where the release occurred, soil gas contamination beyond the boundary of the site where the release occurred, or both pose a threat of exposure to the public above the appropriate Tier 1 remediation objectives (now, the owner of the contaminated property must be contacted only about "soil contamination beyond the boundary of the site where the release occurred"). Defines "soil gas". Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-SOIL GAS, GROUNDWATER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-24 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0603 | |
2009-08-24 | Effective Date August 24, 2009 | |
2009-08-24 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 103-014-000 | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environment & Energy Committee; 017-002-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment & Energy Committee | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 | |
2009-05-21 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-21 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Emil Jones III | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-05-19 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment; 006-000-002 | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment; 008-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Environment; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed - Environment | |
2009-04-28 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Environment | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |