IL HB4021 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the amount and nature of medical assistance.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2014 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2014 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |