IL HB4048 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0580
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0580
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a state's attorney, assistant state's attorney, and state's attorney special investigators may elect to use the address of their place of employment instead of their domicile address when registering a motor vehicle under their name.
Title
VEH CD-VEH REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-18 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0580 | |
2009-08-18 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-18 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-21 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-21 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-001-000 | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Withdrawn by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-05-21 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 010-000-000 | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 007-002-001 | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Transportation | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Held in Transportation | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Transportation | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-05-06 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Transportation; 010-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Postponed - Transportation | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |