IL HB4048 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that names and information of people who have applied for or received certificates of handgun registration are exempt from public inspections and copying. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the National Instant Criminal Background Check System Improvement Fund and the Illinois LEADS Information and Technology Improvement Fund. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Act. Provides that the Act may now be cited to as the "Firearm Owners Identification Card and Certificate of Handgun Registration Act". Defines "certificate of handgun registration" and "handgun". Prohibits any person in the State from carrying or possessing a handgun without a certificate of handgun registration. Sets forth requirements concerning exemptions, applications for registration, registration fees, the distribution of moneys received from certain fees, and the denial of an application. Creates penalties for the possession of a handgun without a current certificate of registration, knowingly providing false or misleading information or evidence in connection with an application, and the failure to report to local law enforcement that a registered handgun is lost, stolen, missing, or destroyed. Sets forth procedures for the return of a certificate of registration for a handgun that is lost, stolen, or otherwise disposed of. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes.
Title
HANDGUN REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4048&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4048.htm |