IL HB4059 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Removes the requirement that educator licensure candidates pass a teacher performance assessment. Makes related changes. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER LICENSURE TEST
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Darren Bailey |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4059&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4059.htm |