IL HB4089 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning justification in the use of force against another person in defense of a dwelling.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Rules Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 7-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |