IL HB4089 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the County Jail Act. Provides that when any prisoner is transferred to the custody of the Department of Human Services, the warden shall supply the Department of Human Services with all necessary information regarding the prisoner, including but not limited to: (1) charged offenses; (2) offense history; (3) suicide risk; (4) history of self-injurious behavior; (5) psychiatric or psychological examinations and reports, or both; (6) medication history and medications currently being administered; (7) all known allergies and drug interaction information; (8) copy of the most recent physical examination; (9) medical reports, consultations, discharge summaries, and diagnoses; (10) known gang affiliations; (11) complete disciplinary history; (12) staff or prisoner assaults, or both; (13) aggressive behavior; (14) known victim profiles; (15) security classification and escape risk; (16) history of drug or alcohol use, or both; (17) information on sexual assaults and predatory behavior; (18) special or religious dietary needs; (19) declared religion or approved religious accommodations, or both; (20) history of dental care and outstanding dental needs; (21) family contact information; and (22) relevant visitor information. Effective immediately.
Title
CTY JAIL-INMATE TRANSFER-DHS
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Sen. Michael Noland [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-31 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0215 |
2015-07-31 | House | Effective Date July 31, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 125 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |