IL HB4090 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Confidentiality Act. Provides that records may be disclosed to law enforcement agencies in connection with the investigation or recovery of a person who has left a mental health or developmental disability facility or the custody of the Department of Human Services without being duly discharged or being free to do so. Provides that an employee of the Department of Human Services may disclose specified information to the appropriate law enforcement and investigating agencies. In a Section concerning the escape of a recipient, changes references to "facility" to "custody of the Department of Human Services". Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
MHDD-ESCAPEES; CONFIDENTIALITY
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Sen. Michael Noland [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-31 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0216 |
2015-07-31 | House | Effective Date July 31, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Noland |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 110 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 110 | 12.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 110 | 12.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |