IL HB4093 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Protect Health Data Privacy Act. Provides that a regulated entity shall disclose and maintain a health data privacy policy that clearly and conspicuously discloses specified information. Sets forth provisions concerning health data privacy policies. Provides that a regulated entity shall not collect, share, or store health data, except in specified circumstances. Provides that it is unlawful for any person to sell or offer to sell health data concerning a consumer without first obtaining valid authorization from the consumer. Provides that a valid authorization to sell consumer health data must contain specified information; a copy of the signed valid authorization must be provided to the consumer; and the seller and purchaser of health data must retain a copy of all valid authorizations for sale of health data for 6 years after the date of its signature or the date when it was last in effect, whichever is later. Sets forth provisions concerning the consent required for collection, sharing, and storage of health data. Provides that a consumer has the right to withdraw consent from the collection, sharing, sale, or storage of the consumer's health data. Provides that it is unlawful for a regulated entity to engage in discriminatory practices against consumers solely because they have not provided consent to the collection, sharing, sale, or storage of their health data or have exercised any other rights provided by the provisions or guaranteed by law. Sets forth provisions concerning a consumer's right to confirm whether a regulated entity is collecting, selling, sharing, or storing any of the consumer's health data; a consumer's right to have the consumer's health data that is collected by a regulated entity deleted; prohibitions regarding geofencing; and consumer health data security. Provides that any person aggrieved by a violation of the provisions shall have a right of action in a State circuit court or as a supplemental claim in federal district court against an offending party. Provides that the Attorney General may enforce a violation of the provisions as an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Defines terms. Makes a conforming change in the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act.
Title
HEALTH DATA PRIVACY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-003-000 |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-05-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4093&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4093.htm |