IL HB4099 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission may adjust the standard award formula for wage differential based on the type of employment, the nature and extent of injuries, and the age of the employee as it relates to the employee's remaining length of career in his or her usual and customary line of employment notwithstanding the injuries.
Title
WRK COMP-WAGE DIFFERENTIAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | To Workers Compensation Subcommittee |
2015-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4099&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4099.htm |