IL HB4104 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 and the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 if and only if Senate Bill 2122 of the 102nd General Assembly becomes law in the form in which it passed both houses on May 30, 2021. In provisions concerning deceptive tactics, expands protections against certain deceptive tactics during custodial interrogation to include persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities (currently, only minors are protected).
Title
CRIM PRO-DECEPTIVE TACTICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2022-04-05 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-06-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-401.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 103-2.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |