IL HB4118 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that each electric and gas utility serving more than 500,000 customers in the State shall implement a Disconnection Protection Program. Provides that where customers have applied for assistance through the Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program (LIHEAP) or Percentage of Income Payment Plan (PIPP), the customer shall be temporarily protected from disconnection for 30 days after the utility receives notice from a local administrative agency that the customer has submitted an application to LIHEAP or PIPP. Provides that, in cases where LIHEAP or PIPP assistance is received, the customer shall be protected from disconnection for another 45 days after receiving the notice. Provides that any customer who applies for, but does not receive, LIHEAP or PIPP assistance shall only be temporarily protected from disconnection once in any program year. Provides that each electric and gas utility may recover costs for implementation, administration, and ongoing operation of the utility's Disconnection Protection Program through the utility's revenue requirement, subject to a review for prudence and reasonableness by the Illinois Commerce Commission.
Title
UTIL-TERMINATION GRACE PERIOD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0661 |
2024-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 015-000-000 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-009-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 017-008-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 016-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2023-10-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-10-18 | House | First Reading |
2023-08-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |