IL HB4147 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-10)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-10)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, he or she knowingly causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 1 felony. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by discharge of a firearm, he or she knows the individual battered to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony.
Title
CRIM CD-AGG BAT DCFS EMPLOYEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-11-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-06 | House | First Reading |
2017-11-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4147&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4147.htm |