IL HB4179 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employment Article of the Illinois Human Rights Act. Defines "family responsibilities" as an employee's actual or perceived provision of personal care to a family member. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for: any employer to refuse to hire, to segregate, to engage in harassment, or to act with respect to recruitment, hiring, promotion, renewal of employment, selection for training or apprenticeship, discharge, discipline, tenure or terms, privileges or conditions of employment on the basis of family responsibilities; any employment agency to fail or refuse to classify properly, accept applications and register for employment referral or apprenticeship referral, refer for employment, or refer for apprenticeship on the basis of family responsibilities; and any labor organization to limit, segregate or classify its membership, or to limit employment opportunities, selection and training for apprenticeship in any trade or craft, or otherwise to take, or fail to take, any action which affects adversely any person's status as an employee or as an applicant for employment or as an apprentice, or as an applicant for apprenticeships, or wages, tenure, hours of employment or apprenticeship conditions on the basis of family responsibilities. Provides that the right to be free of family responsibilities discrimination is in addition to any other rights or remedies afforded by contract or under other provisions of law.
Title
HUMAN RT-FAMILY RESPONSIBILITY
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 005-002-000 |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 005-003-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Immigration & Human Rights Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-10-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 1-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 1-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |