IL HB4216 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a public school to permit a student, without the authorization of the student's parent or legal guardian or a physician, to possess or self-apply sunscreen that is regulated by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Provides that if a student is unable to self-apply sunscreen, a volunteer school employee may apply the sunscreen on the student if the student's parent or legal guardian provides written consent for the assistance. Sets forth provisions concerning liability. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SUNSCREEN PERMITTED
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] |
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4216&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4216.htm |