IL HB4217 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that any board, commission, authority, or other entity authorized or created by State law with the power to award contracts under the Code shall, as a part of the notice required for the awarding of contracts, disclose specified information regarding conflicts of interest. Requires that disclosure must be posted in the online electronic Bulletin along with and conforming to the notice posted for the awarding of contracts. Requires disclosed conflict of interest information to be made available on the electronic Bulletin clearinghouse. Defines "conflict of interest".
Title
PROCURE CD-CONFLICT DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 15-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 15-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |