IL HB4217 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that any supplier of energy that generates more than 500 kilowatt hours of electricity annually within the State (rather than any supplier of energy within the State) and all companies that develop, build, install, or maintain a renewable energy project with total annual revenues over $15,000,000 shall submit an annual report on all procurement goals and actual spending for female-owned, minority-owned, veteran-owned, and small business enterprises in the previous calendar year. Deletes language that exempts specified wind energy and solar energy from having to submit an annual report. Provides that each participating company in its annual report shall include an explanation of the plan for the next year to increase participation, including a buying plan for the specific goods and services the company intends to buy in the next 6 to 18 months, including any procurement codes used by the company, to assist entrepreneurs and diverse companies to understand upcoming opportunities to work with the company submitting the buying plan.
Title
UTILITIES-SUPPLIER DIVERSITY
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
Rep. Edgar Gonzalez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-02-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 021-000-000 |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-11-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 5-117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4217&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4217.htm |